NY A04867 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enables employees to receive electronic confirmation of the information that would otherwise be included in a pay stub; authorizes rules and regulations by the comptroller for electronic confirmation system; requires notification of such system in each employee's paper pay stub
Title
Enables employees to receive electronic confirmation of the information that would otherwise be included in a pay stub; authorizes rules and regulations by the comptroller for electronic confirmation system; requires notification of such system in each employee's paper pay stub
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.225 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.227 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted for a4867a |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2328A |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.245 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-05-01 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.425 |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted by s2328a |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.227 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-03-24 | Assembly | print number 4867a |
2020-03-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02328 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.225