NY A04872 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants eligibility for the tax abatement for industrial and commercial construction work in cities having a population of one million or more, to certain electric generating facilities the operation of which commenced in 2012.
Title
Grants eligibility for the tax abatement for industrial and commercial construction work in cities having a population of one million or more, to certain electric generating facilities the operation of which commenced in 2012.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02389 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07849 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - REFERRED TO CITIES
S07849 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - REFERRED TO CITIES