NY A04879 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits police officers from using racial and ethnic profiling; requires that a procedure be established for the taking and review of complaints against police officers for racial and ethnic profiling; allows an action for injunctive relief and/or damages to be brought against a law enforcement agency, any agent of a law enforcement agency and the supervisor of an agent.
Title
Prohibits police officers from using racial and ethnic profiling; requires that a procedure be established for the taking and review of complaints against police officers for racial and ethnic profiling; allows an action for injunctive relief and/or damages to be brought against a law enforcement agency, any agent of a law enforcement agency and the supervisor of an agent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.347 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.61 |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06555 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE