NY A04879 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - advanced to third reading cal.141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that in toxic tort cases where the specific toxic etiological cause of injury is not known for up to ten years (instead of five years) after the injury itself is discovered a plaintiff shall have three years to file a claim from the time such specific cause is discovered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that in toxic tort cases where the specific toxic etiological cause of injury is not known for up to ten years (instead of five years) after the injury itself is discovered a plaintiff shall have three years to file a claim from the time such specific cause is discovered.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.141
2019-03-12Assemblyreported
2019-03-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S04920 (Same As) 2019-03-29 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback