NY A04892 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to health care and wellness education and outreach programs for preventing sudden cardiac arrest among student athletes including recommending evidenced-based best practices for health certificates required pursuant to the education law, screening exams required for participation in interscholastic athletics, and information for students and their parents and guardians regarding sudden cardiac arrest.
Title
Relates to health care and wellness education and outreach programs for preventing sudden cardiac arrest among student athletes including recommending evidenced-based best practices for health certificates required pursuant to the education law, screening exams required for participation in interscholastic athletics, and information for students and their parents and guardians regarding sudden cardiac arrest.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.188 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.347 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03269 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH