NY A04895 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates lay individuals as one-day marriage officiants in order to solemnize marriages.
Title
Designates lay individuals as one-day marriage officiants in order to solemnize marriages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03652 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - referred to ways and means