NY A04896 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires parole violators in the counties of Jefferson, Oswego, and Saint Lawrence to be transferred to state correctional facilities after 10 days in a local correctional facility.
Title
Requires parole violators in the counties of Jefferson, Oswego, and Saint Lawrence to be transferred to state correctional facilities after 10 days in a local correctional facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in correction |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reference changed to correction |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |