NY A04912 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Unitarian Universalist Congregation of the Great South Bay Sayville to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Permits the Unitarian Universalist Congregation of the Great South Bay Sayville to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.268 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1636 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6460 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.128 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.128 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06460 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.268