NY A04915 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on November 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on November 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to death certificates for persons whose death is caused by an opioid overdose.
Title
Relates to death certificates for persons whose death is caused by an opioid overdose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-05 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.443 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.129 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | substituted for a4915 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.532 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s1668 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.129 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.129 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01668 (Same As) 2019-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.443