NY A04940 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting supervised injection sites; provides that it shall be unlawful for any person to own, operate, work in or volunteer at a supervised injection site; defines terms and establishes penalties.
Title
Relates to prohibiting supervised injection sites; provides that it shall be unlawful for any person to own, operate, work in or volunteer at a supervised injection site; defines terms and establishes penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Assembly | held for consideration in health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00550 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED