NY A04941 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes towns in the Peconic Bay region to establish community housing funds to be funded by a supplemental real estate transfer tax; defines terms; outlines eligible expenses; establishes an advisory board in any town which has established a community housing fund to review and make recommendations regarding the town's community housing plan; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes towns in the Peconic Bay region to establish community housing funds to be funded by a supplemental real estate transfer tax; defines terms; outlines eligible expenses; establishes an advisory board in any town which has established a community housing fund to review and make recommendations regarding the town's community housing plan; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.247 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1766 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4040A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.348 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.348 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 4941b |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | print number 4941a |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04040 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled