NY A04948 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the state office for the aging to include reports on older adults who are primary caregivers or guardians of minors and on substance use disorders among older adults in the office's annual reports to the governor and legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the state office for the aging to include reports on older adults who are primary caregivers or guardians of minors and on substance use disorders among older adults in the office's annual reports to the governor and legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-21Senate3RD READING CAL.744
2019-05-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5489
2019-05-21SenateREFERRED TO AGING
2019-05-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-21Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.348
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-02-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to aging

Same As/Similar To

S05489 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4948

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04948&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04948&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04948
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04948&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04948&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A4948#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04948&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback