NY A04949 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.561
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.561
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the election of members of the board of education of the Buffalo city school district in November rather than in May; creates a timetable for the electoral proceedings therefor; extends the terms of current members of such board to the last day of December rather than June; provides for future terms to run from January through December; and staggers terms.
Title
Provides for the election of members of the board of education of the Buffalo city school district in November rather than in May; creates a timetable for the electoral proceedings therefor; extends the terms of current members of such board to the last day of December rather than June; provides for future terms to run from January through December; and staggers terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.561 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.131 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a4949b |
2019-06-20 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1607 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5224B |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5224A |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5224b |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4949b |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.131 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.131 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 4949a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05224 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.561