NY A04988 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires informed consent for procedures done in the course of education or training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires informed consent for procedures done in the course of education or training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-06Senate3RD READING CAL.456
2019-05-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3353
2019-03-14SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-03-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.117
2019-03-06Assemblyreported
2019-02-06Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S03353 (Same As) 2019-05-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4988

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback