NY A05029 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - signed chap.32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the "Finger Lakes community preservation act"; prohibits the siting of newly constructed incineration facilities in the Finger Lakes region.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the "Finger Lakes community preservation act"; prohibits the siting of newly constructed incineration facilities in the Finger Lakes region.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24Senatesigned chap.32
2019-05-24Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-03-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-20Senate3RD READING CAL.169
2019-03-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2270A
2019-03-14SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2019-03-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.118
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-02-21Assemblyprint number 5029a
2019-02-21Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to energy
2019-02-06Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S02270 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5029A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05029&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05029&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05029
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05029&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05029A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05029&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05029&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A5029#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback