NY A05035 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.516
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.516
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to create a plan regarding non-motorized multi-use trails in consultation with the department of environmental conservation, the department of health and the department of transportation.
Title
Requires the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to create a plan regarding non-motorized multi-use trails in consultation with the department of environmental conservation, the department of health and the department of transportation.
Sponsors
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Asm. Patrick Burke [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.516 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.591 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a5035b |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4416B |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1187 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4416A |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4416b |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.591 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.591 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | print number 5035b |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | print number 5035a |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04416 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.516