NY A05040 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-07 - print number 5040b
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-07 - print number 5040b
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibitions on fur products; prohibits the manufacture, sale, display for sale, trade, giving, donating, or otherwise distributing of a fur product by any means in the state beginning twenty-four months after this act becomes a law.
Title
Relates to prohibitions on fur products; prohibits the manufacture, sale, display for sale, trade, giving, donating, or otherwise distributing of a fur product by any means in the state beginning twenty-four months after this act becomes a law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | print number 5040b |
2020-10-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | print number 5040a |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |