NY A05104 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to integrating community supervision programs into an individual's employment, educational or vocational training schedule.
Title
Relates to integrating community supervision programs into an individual's employment, educational or vocational training schedule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.194 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.81 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.81 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01698 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES