NY A05139 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the participation of minority- and women-owned business enterprises in state contracts by avoiding unnecessary and unjustified bundling of contract requirements that preclude minority- and women-owned business participation.
Title
Encourages the participation of minority- and women-owned business enterprises in state contracts by avoiding unnecessary and unjustified bundling of contract requirements that preclude minority- and women-owned business participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-04-08 | Assembly | print number 5139b |
2020-04-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | print number 5139a |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08767 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - REFERRED TO RULES