NY A05159 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.215
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a tax check off box on personal income tax return forms for gifts for the life pass it on trust fund for gifts for organ and tissue donation outreach and research and provides for certain reporting requirements for such fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a tax check off box on personal income tax return forms for gifts for the life pass it on trust fund for gifts for organ and tissue donation outreach and research and provides for certain reporting requirements for such fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.215
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1744
2018-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1033A
2018-04-30SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-04-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-04-30Assemblypassed assembly
2018-03-29Assemblyamended on third reading 5159b
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.362
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.218
2017-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.218
2017-06-13Assemblyreported
2017-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-05-25Assemblyprint number 5159a
2017-05-25Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2017-02-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S01033 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5159B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05159&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05159&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05159
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05159&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05159A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05159&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05159B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05159&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05159&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05159&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A5159#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback