NY A05169 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the written notices, signs and markers required for pesticides for commercial and residential lawn application to be printed in both the English and Spanish languages and any other languages if the commissioner of environmental conservation deems it necessary.
Title
Requires the written notices, signs and markers required for pesticides for commercial and residential lawn application to be printed in both the English and Spanish languages and any other languages if the commissioner of environmental conservation deems it necessary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.145 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.887 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5579A |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.161 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.161 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | print number 5169a |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05579 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.145