NY A05175 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing an electronic automated system for applications and waiting lists and to developing a written procedure for applicant selection and rejection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing an electronic automated system for applications and waiting lists and to developing a written procedure for applicant selection and rejection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1730
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6499
2019-06-13SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-13Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-13Assemblyrepassed assembly
2019-06-04Assemblyrestored to third reading
2019-06-04Assemblyamend by restoring to original print 5175
2019-06-03Assemblyamended on third reading 5175a
2019-06-03Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2019-06-03AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-03Senaterecalled from senate
2019-05-07SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2019-05-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-07Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.246
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-02-07Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S02537 (Same As) 2019-06-06 - referred to housing
S06499 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5175

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05175&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05175&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05175
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05175&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05175A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05175&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05175&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A5175#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback