NY A05176 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s3594
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s3594
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authorization of the county of Hamilton to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes to the year 2017.
Title
Relates to extending the authorization of the county of Hamilton to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes to the year 2017.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3594 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.527 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.527 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03594 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.163