NY A05178 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting police officers from carrying or using a firearm during any phase of the officer's official duties unless the officer has satisfactorily completed a course of training that meets or exceeds the minimum standards established by the municipal police training council.
Title
Relates to prohibiting police officers from carrying or using a firearm during any phase of the officer's official duties unless the officer has satisfactorily completed a course of training that meets or exceeds the minimum standards established by the municipal police training council.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | print number 5178a |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06540 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE