NY A05187 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - advanced to third reading cal.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to zone pricing of gasoline.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to zone pricing of gasoline.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.193
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-03-26Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-07Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S03496 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback