NY A05190 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the court may, in its discretion, dispense with the defendant's personal appearance at an arraignment whenever such defendant is being held at a secure location outside the courthouse and conduct an electronic arraignment.
Title
Provides that the court may, in its discretion, dispense with the defendant's personal appearance at an arraignment whenever such defendant is being held at a secure location outside the courthouse and conduct an electronic arraignment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01019 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04800 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
S04800 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES