NY A05194 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires motor vehicle dealers to search for recalls and make certain repairs prior to selling a used motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires motor vehicle dealers to search for recalls and make certain repairs prior to selling a used motor vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.82
2019-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.82
2019-06-05Assemblyreported
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-23Assemblyamend by restoring to original print 5194
2019-05-14Assemblyprint number 5194a
2019-05-14Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2019-02-07Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S06059 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 6059A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05194&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05194&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05194
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05194&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05194A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05194&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05194&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05194&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05194&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback