NY A05209 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "War on Terror expeditionary medal" for members of the armed forces or organized militia serving abroad in certain military operations during the war on terror.
Title
Establishes the "War on Terror expeditionary medal" for members of the armed forces or organized militia serving abroad in certain military operations during the war on terror.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2011-02-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03096 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - referred to governmental operations