NY A05219 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - approval memo.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - approval memo.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to individuals who are nominated to serve on the committee to receive notices to submit a certificate of acceptance.
Title
Relates to individuals who are nominated to serve on the committee to receive notices to submit a certificate of acceptance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | approval memo.11 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | signed chap.456 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1774 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5180A |
2019-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.143 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05180 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - approval memo.11