NY A05248 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - print number 5248a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - print number 5248a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York Health program, a comprehensive system of access to health insurance for New York state residents; provides for administrative structure of the plan; provides for powers and duties of the board of trustees, the scope of benefits, payment methodologies and care coordination; establishes the New York Health Trust Fund which would hold monies from a variety of sources to be used solely to finance the plan; enacts provisions relating to financing of New York Health, including a payroll assessment, similar to the Medicare tax; establishes a temporary commission on implementation of the plan; provides for collective negotiations by health care providers with New York Health.
Title
Establishes the New York Health program, a comprehensive system of access to health insurance for New York state residents; provides for administrative structure of the plan; provides for powers and duties of the board of trustees, the scope of benefits, payment methodologies and care coordination; establishes the New York Health Trust Fund which would hold monies from a variety of sources to be used solely to finance the plan; enacts provisions relating to financing of New York Health, including a payroll assessment, similar to the Medicare tax; establishes a temporary commission on implementation of the plan; provides for collective negotiations by health care providers with New York Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | Assembly | print number 5248a |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | committed to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03577 (Same As) 2020-05-19 - PRINT NUMBER 3577A