NY A05268 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - substituted by s3161a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Sergeant Jeremy J. VanNostrand Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Sergeant Jeremy J. VanNostrand Memorial Highway".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07Assemblysubstituted by s3161a
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.248
2019-04-30Assemblyreported
2019-03-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-22Assemblyprint number 5268a
2019-02-22Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2019-02-08Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S03161 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback