NY A05269 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of the occupancy tax in the town of North Castle to 2022.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of the occupancy tax in the town of North Castle to 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.204 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.354 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a5269 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.726 |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3708 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.354 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.354 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03708 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.204