NY A05273 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - print number 5273a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - print number 5273a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates that no employee or officer of the university shall determine the specific details of a student's immigration status except when required by federal law, pursuant to a court order or as required in connection with tuition or financial aid eligibility.
Title
Mandates that no employee or officer of the university shall determine the specific details of a student's immigration status except when required by federal law, pursuant to a court order or as required in connection with tuition or financial aid eligibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | Assembly | print number 5273a |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02550 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - PRINT NUMBER 2550A