NY A05279 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - advanced to third reading cal.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that certain entities may not require a person to provide a copy of his or her criminal history record under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that certain entities may not require a person to provide a copy of his or her criminal history record under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.167
2019-03-26Assemblyreported
2019-02-08Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S02164 (Same As) 2019-01-23 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback