NY A05286 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates rent regulation protections for certain high income tenants; lowers the annual income for certain protections to $125,000.
Title
Eliminates rent regulation protections for certain high income tenants; lowers the annual income for certain protections to $125,000.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Kolb [R] | Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] |
Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in housing |
2020-03-24 | Assembly | print number 5286a |
2020-03-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |