NY A05305 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of distinctive Down's syndrome awareness license plates and the creation of the "Down's syndrome research fund".
Title
Relates to the issuance of distinctive Down's syndrome awareness license plates and the creation of the "Down's syndrome research fund".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.125 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1341 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4013B |
2018-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.947 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | print number 5305b |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | print number 5305a |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04013 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5305B