NY A05308 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.436
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.436
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of safety requirements for moveable soccer goals.
Title
Relates to the establishment of safety requirements for moveable soccer goals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | signed chap.436 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1471 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6811 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-03-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 5308c |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-17 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2014-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.240 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.420 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.420 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | print number 5308b |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | print number 5308a |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04713 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
S06811 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5308C
S06811 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5308C