NY A05308 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-7)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6549
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits employers from seeking salary history from applicants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits employers from seeking salary history from applicants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s6549
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.355
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.355
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-15Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 5308b
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-03-19Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-03-07Assemblyamend by restoring to original print 5308
2019-02-26Assemblyprint number 5308a
2019-02-26Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2019-02-08Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S03692 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S06549 (Same As) 2019-07-10 - SIGNED CHAP.94

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05308&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05308&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05308
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05308&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05308A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05308&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05308B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05308&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05308&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05308&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback