NY A05318 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-28 - signed chap.186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires companies to allow victims of domestic violence to cancel contracts when there is a domestic violence incident report, a police report, an order of protection or a signed affidavit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires companies to allow victims of domestic violence to cancel contracts when there is a domestic violence incident report, a police report, an order of protection or a signed affidavit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-28Senatesigned chap.186
2019-08-27Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-05-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-14Senate3RD READING CAL.119
2019-05-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2356
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2019-05-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-14Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.144
2019-03-12Assemblyreported
2019-03-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-08Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S02356 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5318

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05318&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05318&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05318
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05318&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05318&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A5318#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05318&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback