NY A05344 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to offer a real property tax exemption for property owned by certain persons performing active duty in a combat zone in an amount to the extent of fifteen percent of the assessed value of the real property, but shall not exceed twelve thousand dollars.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to offer a real property tax exemption for property owned by certain persons performing active duty in a combat zone in an amount to the extent of fifteen percent of the assessed value of the real property, but shall not exceed twelve thousand dollars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | print number 5344a |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S02930 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - referred to veterans' affairs