NY A05357 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - advanced to third reading cal.325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - advanced to third reading cal.325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of "direct relationship" for the purposes of article 23-A of the correction law regarding licensures and employment of persons previously convicted of one or more criminal offenses.
Title
Relates to the definition of "direct relationship" for the purposes of article 23-A of the correction law regarding licensures and employment of persons previously convicted of one or more criminal offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.325 |
2012-01-31 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2011-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.389 |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-02-16 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00969 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES