NY A05375 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - signed chap.159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - signed chap.159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the interruption of service during review of an application by the loft board.
Title
Prohibits the interruption of service during review of an application by the loft board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-20 | Senate | signed chap.159 |
2011-07-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.621 |
2011-06-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4035 |
2011-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.170 |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-02-16 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S04035 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5375