NY A05375 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rules and regulations of the state; requires recommendations on repealing unnecessary or otherwise burdensome rules and regulations; requires the repeal of such rules or regulations by the governor.
Title
Relates to rules and regulations of the state; requires recommendations on repealing unnecessary or otherwise burdensome rules and regulations; requires the repeal of such rules or regulations by the governor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-12-06 | Assembly | print number 5375a |
2017-12-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00185 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS