NY A05386 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employees classified as the Triborough bridge and tunnel authority superior officers benevolent association of an MTA-employer and the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations.
Title
Relates to employees classified as the Triborough bridge and tunnel authority superior officers benevolent association of an MTA-employer and the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-13 | Senate | vetoed memo.198 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.523 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3918 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.160 |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03918 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - tabled