NY A05395 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - print number 5395c
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides three options for the designation of sex by applicants for non-driver identification cards, drivers' licenses and learners' permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides three options for the designation of sex by applicants for non-driver identification cards, drivers' licenses and learners' permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyprint number 5395c
2019-06-17Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-30Assemblyprint number 5395b
2019-05-30Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2019-04-17Assemblyprint number 5395a
2019-04-17Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2019-02-11Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S02380 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 2380B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05395&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05395&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05395
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05395&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05395A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05395&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05395B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05395&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05395C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05395&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1

Bill Comments

feedback