NY A05398 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits polystyrene waste.
Title
Prohibits polystyrene waste.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | print number 5398b |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | print number 5398a |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03068 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION