NY A05400 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the use of seatbelts by volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance service workers; provides exception for vehicles which do not have restraint systems provided by the manufacturer or to volunteer firefighters not seated within the confines of the vehicle or emergency medical personnel providing patient care in the rear compartment of an ambulance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the use of seatbelts by volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance service workers; provides exception for vehicles which do not have restraint systems provided by the manufacturer or to volunteer firefighters not seated within the confines of the vehicle or emergency medical personnel providing patient care in the rear compartment of an ambulance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-16SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2014-06-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-06-16Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-16Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.254
2014-06-16Assemblyrules report cal.254
2014-06-16Assemblyreported
2014-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2014-06-06Assemblyprint number 5400b
2014-06-06Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2014-06-03Assemblyreported referred to codes
2014-05-29Assemblyprint number 5400a
2014-05-29Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to transportation
2013-02-25Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S03733 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback