NY A05415 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires liability insurance rate reductions upon completion of a boating safety course or an advanced boating safety course.
Title
Requires liability insurance rate reductions upon completion of a boating safety course or an advanced boating safety course.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.41 |
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.335 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.205 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a5415a |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.769 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3688A |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO INSURANCE |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s3688a |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5415a |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-20 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2020-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.205 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.266 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.266 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03688 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.41