NY A05433 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates, as peace officers, public safety officers of the Chautauqua Institution within the grounds of and properties owned by the Chautauqua Institution.
Title
Designates, as peace officers, public safety officers of the Chautauqua Institution within the grounds of and properties owned by the Chautauqua Institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | print number 5433b |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | print number 5433a |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07283 (Same As) 2020-02-28 - PRINT NUMBER 7283B