NY A05464 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - amended on third reading 5464a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - amended on third reading 5464a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the uniformed court officers of the town of Busti, in the county of Chautauqua, as peace officers.
Title
Designates the uniformed court officers of the town of Busti, in the county of Chautauqua, as peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5464a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.208 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.683 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.683 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |